04/19/2012 | File Number 540 | |||
04/19/2012 | House Calendar Number 395 | |||
04/19/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/19/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/02/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/02/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/08/2012 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |||
02/29/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |