04/26/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 427 | |||
04/26/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/25/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/19/2012 | File Number 541 | |||
04/19/2012 | House Calendar Number 396 | |||
04/19/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/19/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/02/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/02/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/01/2012 | Public Hearing 03/05 | |||
02/29/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |