|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Public Act 12-134
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 432
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
File Number 184
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
House Calendar Number 151
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
|
02/29/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|