|
05/31/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Public Act 12-55
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 5048
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 4815
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 4750
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 4523
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 4182
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 4184
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 4520
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
File Number 597
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 430
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 3972
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 3426
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3891
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House +
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
File Number 313
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
House Calendar Number 254
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|