04/05/2012 | File Number 293 | |||
04/05/2012 | House Calendar Number 226 | |||
04/05/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/05/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/20/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/20/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/14/2012 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
03/13/2012 | Change of Reference Insurance and Real Estate | |||
03/02/2012 | Public Hearing 03/06 | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |