04/02/2012 | File Number 222 | |||
04/02/2012 | House Calendar Number 190 | |||
04/02/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/02/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/20/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/20/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/08/2012 | Public Hearing 03/13 | |||
03/02/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |