04/18/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 373 | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/17/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/11/2012 | File Number 352 | |||
04/11/2012 | House Calendar Number 278 | |||
04/11/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/11/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/04/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/26/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/05/2012 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |||
03/02/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |