|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Public Act 12-135
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 477
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
File Number 570
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
House Calendar Number 436
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/07/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|