03/27/2012 | File Number 147 | |||
03/27/2012 | House Calendar Number 126 | |||
03/27/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/27/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/15/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/08/2012 | Public Hearing 03/13 | |||
03/07/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |