06/15/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/31/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/29/2012 | Public Act 12-137 | |||
05/09/2012 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/09/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/18/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 375 | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/17/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/12/2012 | File Number 395 | |||
04/12/2012 | House Calendar Number 305 | |||
04/12/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/12/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/28/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/28/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/20/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/19/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/15/2012 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary | |||
03/08/2012 | Public Hearing 03/13 | |||
03/07/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |