06/08/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/25/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/23/2012 | Public Act 12-107 | |||
05/08/2012 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/08/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/26/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 426 | |||
04/26/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/25/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/16/2012 | File Number 447 | |||
04/16/2012 | House Calendar Number 344 | |||
04/16/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/16/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/09/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/30/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/29/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/12/2012 | Public Hearing 03/19 | |||
03/07/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |