04/04/2012 | File Number 258 | |||
04/04/2012 | House Calendar Number 211 | |||
04/04/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/04/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/26/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/09/2012 | Public Hearing 03/13 | |||
03/07/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |