|
05/31/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Public Act 12-64
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 399
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
File Number 558
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3406
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
File Number 259
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
House Calendar Number 212
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/16
|
|
|
|
03/07/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|