04/20/2012 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/20/2012 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/20/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/20/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/18/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/17/2012 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/02/2012 | File Number 225 | |||
04/02/2012 | House Calendar Number 193 | |||
04/02/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/14/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/08/2012 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |||
03/07/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |