|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Public Act 12-121
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 530
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5352
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
File Number 448
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
House Calendar Number 345
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
|
03/07/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|