Connecticut 2012 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05463 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 5463
22 February Session, 2012 LCO No. 2047
3- *_____HB05463GAE___032212____*
3+ *02047_______GAE*
44 Referred to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
55 Introduced by:
66 (GAE)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 5463
1111
1212 February Session, 2012
1313
1414 LCO No. 2047
1515
16-*_____HB05463GAE___032212____*
16+*02047_______GAE*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (GAE)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING REQUESTS FOR RECORDS UNDER THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT AND APPOINTMENTS TO THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION COMMISSION.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 1-205 of the 2012 supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2012):
2929
3030 (a) There shall be established, within the Office of Governmental Accountability established under section 1-300, a Freedom of Information Commission consisting of nine members. (1) Five of such members shall be appointed by the Governor, with the advice and consent of either house of the General Assembly. Such members shall serve for terms of four years from July first of the year of their appointment, except that of the members appointed prior to and serving on July 1, 1977, one shall serve for a period of six years from July 1, 1975, one shall serve for a period of four years from July 1, 1975, and one shall serve for a period of six years from July 1, 1977. Of the two new members first appointed by the Governor after July 1, 1977, one shall serve from the date of such appointment until June 30, 1980, and one shall serve from the date of such appointment until June 30, 1982. (2) On and after July 1, 2011, four members of the commission shall be appointed as follows: One by the president pro tempore of the Senate, one by the minority leader of the Senate, one by the speaker of the House of Representatives and one by the minority leader of the House of Representatives. Such members shall serve for terms of [two] four years from July first of the year of their appointment. (3) No more than five members of the commission shall be members of the same political party. Any vacancy in the membership of the commission shall be filled by the appointing authority for the unexpired portion of the term.
3131
3232 Sec. 2. Subsection (a) of section 1-212 of the 2012 supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2012):
3333
3434 (a) Any person applying in writing or by oral request under this chapter shall receive, promptly upon such written or oral request, a plain, facsimile, electronic or certified copy of any public record. The public agency may require that such request be made in writing. The type of copy provided shall be within the discretion of the public agency, except (1) the agency shall provide a certified copy whenever requested, and (2) if the applicant does not have access to a computer or facsimile machine, the public agency shall not send the applicant an electronic or facsimile copy. The fee for any copy provided in accordance with the Freedom of Information Act:
3535
3636 (A) By an executive, administrative or legislative office of the state, a state agency or a department, institution, bureau, board, commission, authority or official of the state, including a committee of, or created by, such an office, agency, department, institution, bureau, board, commission, authority or official, and also including any judicial office, official or body or committee thereof but only in respect to its or their administrative functions, shall not exceed twenty-five cents per page; and
3737
3838 (B) By all other public agencies, as defined in section 1-200, shall not exceed fifty cents per page. If any copy provided in accordance with said Freedom of Information Act requires a transcription, or if any person applies for a transcription of a public record, the fee for such transcription shall not exceed the cost thereof to the public agency.
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4444 Section 1 July 1, 2012 1-205(a)
4545 Sec. 2 October 1, 2012 1-212(a)
4646
4747 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4848
4949 Section 1
5050
5151 July 1, 2012
5252
5353 1-205(a)
5454
5555 Sec. 2
5656
5757 October 1, 2012
5858
5959 1-212(a)
6060
61+Statement of Purpose:
6162
63+To change the term of the legislatively appointed members of the Freedom of Information Commission from two years to four years, and to clarify that requests under the Freedom of Information Act may be oral rather than written.
6264
63-GAE Joint Favorable
64-
65-GAE
66-
67-Joint Favorable
65+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]