05/05/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 499 | |||
05/05/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/04/2012 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |||
05/04/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/20/2012 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/20/2012 | No New File by Committee on Environment | |||
04/20/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/19/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/17/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Environment | |||
04/10/2012 | File Number 317 | |||
04/10/2012 | House Calendar Number 258 | |||
04/10/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/02/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/27/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/09/2012 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |