04/23/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 422 | |||
04/23/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/19/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/12/2012 | File Number 398 | |||
04/12/2012 | House Calendar Number 308 | |||
04/12/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/12/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/28/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/28/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/08/2012 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |