04/24/2012 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/24/2012 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/24/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/24/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/23/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/20/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/16/2012 | File Number 450 | |||
04/16/2012 | House Calendar Number 347 | |||
04/16/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/09/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/28/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/08/2012 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |