|
04/20/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
File Number 414
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
House Calendar Number 331
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/16/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|