06/15/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/01/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/30/2012 | Special Act 12-4 | |||
05/09/2012 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/09/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/26/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 424 | |||
04/26/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/25/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/17/2012 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/17/2012 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/17/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/04/2012 | File Number 261 | |||
04/04/2012 | House Calendar Number 214 | |||
04/04/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/12/2012 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |