|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Public Act 12-143
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 478
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
File Number 488
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
House Calendar Number 364
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/16/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations
|
|
|