|
06/08/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Public Act 12-110
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2012
|
File Number 651
|
|
|
|
05/05/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 502
|
|
|
|
05/05/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4175
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
File Number 321
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
House Calendar Number 262
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
03/16/2012
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations
|
|
|