06/15/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/31/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/29/2012 | Public Act 12-140 | |||
05/09/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
05/09/2012 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/09/2012 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/23/2012 | File Number 585 | |||
04/23/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 408 | |||
04/23/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/19/2012 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/19/2012 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3261 | |||
04/10/2012 | File Number 322 | |||
04/10/2012 | House Calendar Number 263 | |||
04/10/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/10/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/02/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/26/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/26/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/12/2012 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |