06/15/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/31/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/29/2012 | Public Act 12-141 | |||
05/09/2012 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/09/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
05/07/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 523 | |||
05/07/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/07/2012 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |||
05/07/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/18/2012 | File Number 511 | |||
04/18/2012 | House Calendar Number 387 | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/18/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/12/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/02/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/02/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/15/2012 | Public Hearing 03/19 | |||
03/12/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |