04/12/2012 | File Number 399 | |||
04/12/2012 | House Calendar Number 309 | |||
04/12/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/12/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/27/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/26/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/19/2012 | Public Hearing 03/23 | |||
03/12/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |