04/23/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/19/2012 | File Number 546 | |||
04/19/2012 | House Calendar Number 401 | |||
04/19/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/19/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/02/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/02/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2012 | Public Hearing 03/19 | |||
03/12/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |