06/08/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/25/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/23/2012 | Public Act 12-112 | |||
05/08/2012 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/08/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
05/05/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 497 | |||
05/05/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/04/2012 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |||
05/04/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/18/2012 | File Number 514 | |||
04/18/2012 | House Calendar Number 390 | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/18/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/12/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/02/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/02/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/19/2012 | Public Hearing 03/23 | |||
03/13/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |