|
05/14/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Public Act 12-30
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 401
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
File Number 561
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 3429
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 3301
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Bill Passed Temporarily
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 3301
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
File Number 323
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
House Calendar Number 264
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/16/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/21
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|