|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Public Act 12-185
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 517
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5213
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
File Number 491
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
House Calendar Number 367
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/16/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/21
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|