04/16/2012 | File Number 452 | |||
04/16/2012 | House Calendar Number 349 | |||
04/16/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/16/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/09/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/30/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/29/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/26/2012 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | |||
03/16/2012 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |||
03/14/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |