04/10/2012 | File Number 324 | |||
04/10/2012 | House Calendar Number 265 | |||
04/10/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/10/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/02/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/23/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/16/2012 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |||
03/14/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |