05/04/2012 | File Number 638 | |||
05/04/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 481 | |||
05/04/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/03/2012 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |||
05/03/2012 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/03/2012 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4565 | |||
04/17/2012 | File Number 495 | |||
04/17/2012 | House Calendar Number 371 | |||
04/17/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/17/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/30/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/29/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/16/2012 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |