|
06/08/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Public Act 12-113
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
File Number 618
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 442
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4202
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
File Number 548
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
House Calendar Number 403
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/29
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|