06/15/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/01/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/30/2012 | Special Act 12-8 | |||
05/09/2012 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/09/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
05/02/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 453 | |||
05/02/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/01/2012 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |||
05/01/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/16/2012 | File Number 454 | |||
04/16/2012 | House Calendar Number 351 | |||
04/16/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/16/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/09/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/28/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/28/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/16/2012 | Public Hearing 03/20 | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |