04/19/2012 | File Number 550 | |||
04/19/2012 | House Calendar Number 405 | |||
04/19/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/19/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/02/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/02/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2012 | Public Hearing 03/29 | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |