|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 544
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5122
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
File Number 552
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
House Calendar Number 407
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/29
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|