04/30/2012 | House Calendar Number 469 | |||
04/30/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/18/2012 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |||
04/18/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/18/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/18/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/11/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/19/2012 | File Number 27 | |||
03/19/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 69 | |||
03/12/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/08/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/10/2012 | Public Hearing 02/16 | |||
02/08/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |