|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Public Act 12-148
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/06/2012
|
House Calendar Number 518
|
|
|
|
05/06/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/05/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
|
05/05/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5079
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
File Number 401
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 289
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/16/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/20
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|