04/26/2012 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/26/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/26/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/26/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/25/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/24/2012 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/20/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/16/2012 | File Number 416 | |||
04/16/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 303 | |||
04/09/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/26/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/15/2012 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |||
02/15/2012 | Public Hearing 02/21 | |||
02/09/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |