04/18/2012 | File Number 516 | |||
04/18/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 356 | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/18/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/12/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/04/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/03/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/07/2012 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |||
02/09/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |