|
06/08/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Public Act 12-92
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
House Calendar Number 470
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3970
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
File Number 152
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 138
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|