|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Public Act 12-149
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Calendar Number 530
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4759
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Bill Passed Temporarily
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
File Number 598
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
File Number 43
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 79
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|