|
06/08/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Public Act 12-93
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
House Calendar Number 485
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4675
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
File Number 402
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 293
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|