05/04/2012 | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
05/04/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/04/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/04/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/04/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/01/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
03/27/2012 | File Number 115 | |||
03/27/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 126 | |||
03/20/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/13/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/09/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |