|
06/06/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Public Act 12-70
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 5195
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 5193
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 5194
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
House Calendar Number 487
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 4646
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 4676
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4658
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
File Number 157
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 170
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|