05/31/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/18/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/15/2012 | Public Act 12-68 | |||
05/08/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
05/08/2012 | House Passed | |||
05/08/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/28/2012 | House Calendar Number 455 | |||
04/28/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/26/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/18/2012 | No New File by Committee on Energy and Technology | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/17/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology | |||
03/29/2012 | File Number 158 | |||
03/29/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 166 | |||
03/23/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/15/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |