03/27/2012 | File Number 116 | |||
03/27/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 117 | |||
03/27/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/27/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/20/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/16/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/01/2012 | Public Hearing 03/06 | |||
02/15/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |