|
05/02/2012
|
House Calendar Number 486
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 4385
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
File Number 29
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 70
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|