04/19/2012 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/19/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/19/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/19/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/19/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/04/2012 | File Number 262 | |||
04/04/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 211 | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/21/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/02/2012 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |